+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/16/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 16, 2016: CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor