+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 574
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/5/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/25/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/18/2020
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2020: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 18, 2020: HOUSE FACILITIES, LICENSURE, & REGULATIONS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor