+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 722
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0771)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0675)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/10/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2016
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/24/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 24, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 30
March 10, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 10, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95