+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor