+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
- Pub. Ch. 679
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0774)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0706)
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 11, PNV 1
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0723)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0908)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/20/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/27/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2/21/2018
- Roll one week places
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
March 28, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
March 26, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 11
March 20, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 20, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 14, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 14, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 27, 2018: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 27, 2018: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 21, 2018: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
February 21, 2018: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor