+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Def. to Summer Study
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/23/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2/23/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/16/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor