+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 709
On April 1, 2024 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024
On March 27, 2024 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Action def. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee to 3/27/2024
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/27/2024
On March 19, 2024 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- No Action Taken
- Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/20/2024
On March 11, 2024 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/13/2024
On March 5, 2024 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/5/2024
On February 27, 2024 in the House:
- Ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
On January 29, 2024 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On January 25, 2024 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 24, 2024 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2024: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 27, 2024: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 5, 2024: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor