+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/23/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 17, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor