+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 223
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/29/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/17/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92