+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 04/08/2022
- Pub. Ch. 810
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 3
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0694)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0645)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 62, Nays 19, PNV 3
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2022
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2022
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3