+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/25/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 18, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor