+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014
- H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/14/2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 23, Nays 3
- S. adopted am. 1
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0794)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/5/2014
- Action Def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/5/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/26/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/18/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/18/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/11/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0794
Amendment 1-0 to HB2048
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92