+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Failed for lack of second in: Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor