+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 148
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction