+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 4/3/2018
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2018: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
March 21, 2018: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (3)
Ramsey
Type:
Primary Sponsor