+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor