+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Business and Utilities Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/26/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 18, 2014: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor