+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to Summer Study
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/5/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.