+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Failed for lack of motion in: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/31/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/31/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/24/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
- Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/18/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.