+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
- Pub. Ch. 388
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 0, PNV 3
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 11, PNV 4
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/6/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/23/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/23/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (7)
April 27, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 12, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 12, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
April 6, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 31, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 23, 2021: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 9, 2021: HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor