+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
- Sponsor change.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor