+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 4/1/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/26/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/26/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/12/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA1105
Amendment 1-0 to HB2005
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2014: CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE
March 26, 2014: CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor