+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/25/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.