+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Sponsor change.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/15/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/15/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/8/2022
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Def. to Summer Study in Insurance Subcommittee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/23/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Ref. to Insurance Committee -- Government Operations for Review
- P2C held on desk.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 6, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor