+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 786
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/15/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2016
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 21, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 15, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 9, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 1, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 24, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor