+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1045
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Transportation Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2016
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Transportation
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 22, 2016: TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 15, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Transportation Committee
March 2, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor