+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Moved to Heel of Calendar
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 6/4/2020
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 5/28/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Safety & Funding Subcommittee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 15, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2020: HOUSE TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1