+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 12
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/26/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/12/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction