+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 857
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 75, Nays 7, PNV 8
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/23/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 3, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 8
February 23, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 17, 2016: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor