+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 756
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020
On June 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/4/2020
- Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/4/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/26/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/19/2020
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 4, 2020: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 19, 2020: HOUSE CHILDREN & FAMILIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
T. Hill
Type:
Primary Sponsor