+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar #2 for 4/21/2022
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2022
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/23/2022
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/16/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/8/2022
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (6)
April 21, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 21, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 20, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 19, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 16, 2022: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 8, 2022: HOUSE HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor