+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2014
- Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/15/2014
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/8/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/1/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/26/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
- Re-ref. to Local Government Subcommittee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 16, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 8, 2014: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
April 1, 2014: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
March 26, 2014: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor