+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 1014
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0992)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0892)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/29/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/16/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 18, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 31
April 7, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91