+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 677
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/1/2016
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.