+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.