+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2022
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction