+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 192
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
- No Action Taken
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
- No Action Taken
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
- No Action Taken
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/6/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
April 15, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 27, 2019: HOUSE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 26, 2019: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor