+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 884
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/22/2022
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/16/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2022
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/23/2022
- Action def. in Education Administration to 2/23/2022
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/16/2022
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/8/2022
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 22, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 16, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 23, 2022: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 8, 2022: HOUSE HIGHER EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor