+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Failed for Lack of Motion in: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to last calendar
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/8/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2