+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/9/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/16/2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Re-ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/2/2020
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/2/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/24/2020
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Ref. to Government Operations Committee
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor