+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 701
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/18/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/4/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 20, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 18, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 26, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor