+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 618
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/10/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/18/2020
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (6)
March 16, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
March 16, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 10, 2020: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 4, 2020: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 26, 2020: HOUSE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 18, 2020: HOUSE K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor