+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/12/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Government Operations for review--Finance
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.