+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 637
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Move to Heel
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/13/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
- Move to Heel
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
March 19, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 19, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 13, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 13, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 7, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
March 7, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor