+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/26/2020
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2020: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
May 27, 2020: HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 11, 2020: HOUSE PUBLIC SERVICE & EMPLOYEES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor