+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 757
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0885)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 30
March 21, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 21, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94