+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Sales Tax Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor