+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 393
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/25/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/5/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
- Move to Heel
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
May 4, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
May 4, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 25, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 25, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 19, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 19, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 5, 2017: HOUSE BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 5, 2017: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 28, 2017: HOUSE BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
March 28, 2017: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
+ − Sponsors (3)
DeBerry
Type:
Primary Sponsor