+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to next calendar
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/25/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.