+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 865
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2022
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2022
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/1/2022
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/22/2022
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction